Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 644 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 7205 Week
» 28107 Month
» 28107 Year
» 1249672 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6592 16/03/1962
TOPS (Tops) 33207 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Cost when Built £
To Service 16/03/1962
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 16/03/1962
73D St Leonards 4w/e 22/07/1963
73C Hither Green w/e 20/10/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/03/1962 To Service To service as D6592
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (73D)    
20/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
27/10/1968 Sightings Hither Green depot: On shed RO 12/1968 Link
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 33207    

prev prev