Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4136 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17542 Week
» 70558 Month
» 190085 Year
» 3216938 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6775 |
24/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37075 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Clayton RO2500/03 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
24/09/1962 to Thornaby (51L) |
Withdrawn |
26/11/1999 |
Time in Service |
37 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1999 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
24/09/1962 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/09/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/09/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6775 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
06/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
27/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37075 |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
26/11/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37075 |
|
|
12/1999 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|