Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3933 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17339 Week
» 70355 Month
» 189882 Year
» 3216735 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6777 |
12/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37077 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
37 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Works Number |
3069/8323 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Split Headcode Boxes Nose end Gangway |
|
To Service |
12/10/1962 to Thornaby (51L) |
Withdrawn |
30/09/2008 |
Time in Service |
45 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
12/10/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
20/08/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/10/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
20/08/1971 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6777 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3069 Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
21/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
20/08/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37077 |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
30/09/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37077 |
|
|