Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2735 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16141 Week
» 69157 Month
» 188684 Year
» 3215537 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6778 |
29/10/1962 |
|
TOPS (37/0) |
37078 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
29/10/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 15/02/1969 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
07/04/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 04/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
|
Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/10/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 15/02/1969 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
07/04/1971 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
xot |
Dual brakes, No heat, Extended Fuel Tanks |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
18/08/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6778 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Thornaby (51L) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
07/04/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
31/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (SY) |
|
|
27/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MR) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 37078 |
|
|
04/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Twin fuel tanks fitted |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
31/01/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 37078 |
|
|
26/02/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|