Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 163 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 163 Week
» 39209 Month
» 413222 Year
» 1634787 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6787 31/12/1962  
TOPS (37/0) 37087 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3731/12/1962
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Clayton RO2500/03
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Split Headcode Boxes
Nose end Gangway
To Service 31/12/1962 to Gateshead (52A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52A Gateshead (New) on 31/12/1962
50A York (North) 4w/e 16/07/1966
50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 25/02/1967
51L Thornaby 4w/e 20/05/1967
52A Gateshead 4w/e 17/06/1967
51L Thornaby 4w/e 07/10/1967
52A Gateshead w/e 28/12/1968
TE Thornaby 2w/e 11/01/1975
TI Tinsley 3w/e 12/07/1975
MR March 3w/e 02/05/1976


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1962 To Service To service as British Railways Number D6787
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Gateshead (52A)
   
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
20/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
17/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
28/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 37087 (37/0)    
11/01/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
12/07/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to March (MR)    

prev prev