Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 160 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 160 Week
» 39206 Month
» 413219 Year
» 1634784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6788 14/01/1963  
TOPS (37/0) 37088 02/1974  
TOPS (37/3 (1)) 37323 23/07/1986  
TOPS (37/0 (R)) 37088 18/09/1989  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3714/01/1963
37/3 v123/07/1986
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Clayton RO2500/03
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Split Headcode Boxes
Nose end Gangway
To Service 14/01/1963 to Gateshead (52A)
Withdrawn 30/09/2002
Time in Service 39 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 03/10/2002
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52A Gateshead (New) on 14/01/1963
50A York (North) 4w/e 16/07/1966
50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 25/02/1967
41A Tinsley w/e 11/10/1969
   Withdrawn on 30/09/2002


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
14/01/1963 To Service To service as British Railways Number D6788
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Gateshead (52A)
   
16/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B)    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 37088 (37/0)    
23/07/1986 Renumbered Renumbered to 37323 (37/3 (1))    
18/09/1989 Renumbered Renumbered to 37088 (37/0 (R))    
30/09/2002 Withdrawn Condemned as 37088    
03/10/2002 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev