Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 538 Today
» 1100 Yesterday
» 5794 Week
» 24377 Month
» 221894 Year
» 298481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6905 05/11/1963
TOPS (37/0) 37205 01/01/1973
TOPS (37/6a) 37688 1986

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
To Service 05/11/1963
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87E Landore (New) 05/11/1963
86A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 31/08/1967
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/06/1968
66A Polmadie 5w/e 30/11/1968
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/11/1963 To Service To service as D6905
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Landore (87E)
   
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
01/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
30/11/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
17/07/1969 Sightings Motherwell depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 37205    
1986 Renumbered Renumbered to 37688    

prev prev