Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 183 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1282 Week
» 7416 Month
» 235300 Year
» 1456865 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6936 29/04/1964  
TOPS (37/0) 37236 03/1974  
TOPS (37/6a) 37682 1986  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 37
Wheels Co-Co
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Central Headcode Box
To Service 29/04/1964
Withdrawn 10/2014
Time in Service 50 yrs, 5 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 04/11/2016
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87E Landore (New) 29/04/1964
86A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 20/07/1964
65A Eastfield 4w/e 27/04/1968
64B Haymarket 4w/e 28/09/1968
65A Eastfield 4w/e 31/10/1970
87A Landore w/e 11/11/1972

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 5w/e 06/04/1968
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 3w/e 27/04/1968
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 8w/e 01/06/1968
ALLOC 64B Haymarket 4w/e 28/09/1968
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 6w/e 10/10/1970

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
29/04/1964 To Service To service as D6936
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Landore (87E)
   
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
27/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
28/09/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
31/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
11/11/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 37236    
1986 Renumbered Renumbered to 37682    

prev prev