Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 174 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 174 Week
» 39220 Month
» 413233 Year
» 1634798 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D7076 03/05/1963  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 35
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3503/05/1963
Wheels B-B
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number BP3039
Works Number 7980
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Spanner Mk 3
AWS Western Region AWS fitted
To Service 03/05/1963 to Old Oak Common (81A)
Withdrawn 06/05/1973
Time in Service 10 yrs , 3 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
81A Old Oak Common (New) on 03/05/1963
86A Cardiff Canton 9w/e 18/03/1968
82A Bristol Bath Road 9w/e 08/01/1972
   Withdrawn on 06/05/1973

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
03/05/1963 To Service To service as British Railways Number D7076
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 7980
Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A)
   
18/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
06/05/1973 Withdrawn Condemned as D7076    

prev prev