Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 219 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 1058 Week
» 17037 Month
» 212491 Year
» 1096872 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8000 18/06/1957
TOPS (Tops) 20050 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/06/1957
Withdrawn 14/12/1980
Time in Service 23 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1D Devons Road (Bow) (New) 18/06/1957
18A Toton 4w/e 12/07/1958
5B Crewe South 4w/e 04/10/1958
1B Camden w/e 29/10/1960
1A Willesden w/e 02/10/1965
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 09/08/1969
41A Tinsley w/e 17/10/1970
64B Haymarket w/e 09/10/1971
65A Eastfield 4w/e 24/02/1973
64B Haymarket 4w/e 21/04/1973
TO Toton w/e 10/11/1973
   Stored w/e 09/08/1975
TO Toton 4w/e 08/11/1975
   Withdrawn 14/12/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/06/1957 To Service To service as D8000
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D)
   
12/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
04/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
29/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
02/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
09/08/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
17/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20050    
24/02/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
21/04/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
10/11/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (TO)    
01/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
09/08/1975 Allocation      
09/08/1975 To Store To Store    
08/11/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (TO)    
14/12/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 20050    

prev