Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 692 Today
» 1287 Yesterday
» 1979 Week
» 31565 Month
» 405578 Year
» 1627143 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8001 08/07/1957  
TOPS (20/0) 20001 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2008/07/1957
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 08/07/1957 to Devons Road (Bow) (1D)
Withdrawn 20/04/1988 off Toton (TO)
Time in Service 30 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1D Devons Road (Bow) (New) on 08/07/1957
5B Crewe South 4w/e 06/09/1958
1A Willesden w/e 29/10/1960
D01 London Division on 18/04/1966
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 09/08/1969
41A Tinsley w/e 17/10/1970
64B Haymarket w/e 09/10/1971
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 24/03/1973
   Stored w/e 09/08/1975
TO Toton 4w/e 08/11/1975
   Withdrawn on 20/04/1988

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
08/07/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8001
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D)
   
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
29/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
09/08/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
17/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20001 (20/0)    
24/03/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
09/08/1975 Allocation      
09/08/1975 To Store To Store    
08/11/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (TO)    
20/04/1988 Withdrawn Condemned as 20001 from Toton (TO)    

prev prev