Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 309 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 309 Week
» 30599 Month
» 333789 Year
» 1555354 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8007 19/09/1957  
TOPS (20/0) 20007 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2019/09/1957
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 19/09/1957 to Devons Road (Bow) (1D)
Withdrawn 01/07/1993
Time in Service 35 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1D Devons Road (Bow) (New) on 19/09/1957
1A Willesden w/e 15/02/1964
D01 London Division on 18/04/1966
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 12/07/1969
41A Tinsley w/e 17/10/1970
64B Haymarket w/e 09/10/1971
65A Eastfield 4w/e 24/02/1973
64B Haymarket 4w/e 21/04/1973
IM Immingham 2w/e 12/10/1974
TI Tinsley w/e 08/03/1975
   Withdrawn on 01/07/1993

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
19/09/1957 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8007
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D)
   
15/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
12/07/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
17/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20007 (20/0)    
24/02/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
21/04/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
12/10/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (TI)    
01/07/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 20007    
01/07/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 20007    

prev prev