Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 865 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 865 Week
» 12158 Month
» 276791 Year
» 1498356 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8048 31/12/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 20048 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 31/12/1959 to Hornsey (34B)
Withdrawn 01/11/1990
Time in Service 30 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) on 31/12/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
40B Immingham w/e 23/04/1966
52A Gateshead (on loan) w/e 09/09/1967
52A Gateshead (loan made permanent) m/e 30/09/1967
D16 Nottingham Division (on loan) w/e 18/11/1967
D16 Nottingham Division (loan made permanent) m/e 12/1967
41A Tinsley w/e 17/10/1970
65A Eastfield w/e 09/10/1971
91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 06/03/1976
   Withdrawn on 01/11/1990

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/12/1959 To Service To service as D8048
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
09/09/1967 Allocation Loaned to Gateshead (52A)    
18/11/1967 Allocation Loaned to Nottingham Division (D16)    
17/10/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20048    
06/03/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
01/11/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 20048    

prev prev