Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 900 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18703 Week
» 71719 Month
» 191246 Year
» 3218099 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8060 |
24/05/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20060 |
11/10/1973 |
|
TOPS (20/9) |
20902 |
04/05/1989 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 20 | 24/05/1961 | 20/9 | 04/05/1989 |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2966/8218 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
24/05/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
24/05/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/05/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/05/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8060 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2966 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
11/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20060 |
|
|
04/05/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20902 |
|
|