Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1520 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19323 Week
» 72339 Month
» 191866 Year
» 3218719 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8065 |
19/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20065 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2971/8223 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
19/06/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
08/01/1991 |
Time in Service |
29 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys |
Cut Up |
01/1991 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
19/06/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1973 |
|
BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/06/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8065 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2971 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/10/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20065 |
|
|
01/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|
08/01/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20065 |
|
|