Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3785 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17191 Week
» 70207 Month
» 189734 Year
» 3216587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8068 |
26/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20068 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2974/8226 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
26/06/1961 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
16/06/1987 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys |
Cut Up |
07/12/1993 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
26/06/1961 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
12/1983 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/06/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
06/1970 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
12/1983 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8068 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2974 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20068 |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
10/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
04/10/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Leicester Midland (LR) |
|
|
10/11/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Toton (TO) |
|
|
12/1983 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
16/06/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20068 |
|
|
07/12/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|