Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 455 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18258 Week
» 71274 Month
» 190801 Year
» 3217654 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8070 |
30/06/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20070 |
05/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2976/8228 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
30/06/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawn |
11/04/1991 |
Time in Service |
29 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys |
Cut Up |
07/12/1992 |
Cut At |
MC Metals (Springburn) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
30/06/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/06/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8070 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2976 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
28/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
25/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20070 |
|
|
11/04/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20070 |
|
|
07/12/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|