Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19936 Week
» 72952 Month
» 192479 Year
» 3219332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8075 |
26/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20075 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) |
20308 |
26/03/1998 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
2981/8233 |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
26/07/1961 to Eastfield (65A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
26/07/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/07/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8075 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 2981 Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/07/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20075 |
|
|
26/03/1998 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20308 |
|
|