Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1128 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18931 Week
» 71947 Month
» 191474 Year
» 3218327 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8091 |
10/10/1961 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20091 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
10/10/1961 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1974 |
|
Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/10/1961 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/10/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8091 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
02/06/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20091 |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Snowplough brackets fitted |
|
|
07/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/09/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20091 |
|
|
30/11/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|