Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2892 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16298 Week
» 69314 Month
» 188841 Year
» 3215694 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8110 |
10/01/1962 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20110 |
12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
10/01/1962 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawn |
14/09/1990 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys |
Cut Up |
17/09/1991 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
10/01/1962 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/01/1962 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/01/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8110 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Eastfield (65A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20110 |
|
|
09/08/1981 |
To Store |
To Store at Aberdeen Ferryhill (AB) |
|
|
14/09/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 20110 |
|
|
17/09/1991 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|