Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 257 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 257 Week
» 30547 Month
» 333737 Year
» 1555302 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8117 23/02/1962  
TOPS (20/0) 20117 01/01/1973  
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) 20314 02/11/1998  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2023/02/1962
20/3 (DRS)02/11/1998
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Disc Route Indicators
To Service 23/02/1962 to Polmadie (66A)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
66A Polmadie (New) on 23/02/1962
65A Eastfield 3w/e 29/09/1962
66A Polmadie 5w/e 30/05/1964
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
0000 Withdrawn Condemned as 20314    
23/02/1962 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8117
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Allocated to Polmadie (66A)
   
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
30/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20117 (20/0)    
02/11/1998 Renumbered Renumbered to 20314 (20/3 (RFS))    

prev prev