Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4337 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17743 Week
» 70759 Month
» 190286 Year
» 3217139 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D8117 |
23/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (20/0) |
20117 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (20/3 (RFS)) |
20314 |
02/11/1998 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
20 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
23/02/1962 to Polmadie (66A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with grey roof, red bufferbeams |
23/02/1962 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/02/1962 |
vo |
Vacuum brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/02/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D8117 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Polmadie (66A) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
29/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
30/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20117 |
|
|
02/11/1998 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 20314 |
|
|