Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 296 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 296 Week
» 30586 Month
» 333776 Year
» 1555341 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8142 21/05/1966  
TOPS (20/0) 20142 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2021/05/1966
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Central Headcode Box
To Service 21/05/1966 to Birmingham Division (D02)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D02 Birmingham Division (New) on 21/05/1966
ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 03/02/1968
D16 Nottingham Division on 17/06/1968


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
0000 Withdrawn Condemned as 20142    
21/05/1966 To Service To service as British Railways Number D8142
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Birmingham Division (D02)
   
03/02/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20142 (20/0)    

prev prev