Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 391 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6367 Week
» 12501 Month
» 240385 Year
» 1461950 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D8177 18/11/1966  
TOPS (Tops) 20177 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 20
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Central Headcode Box
To Service 18/11/1966
Withdrawn 23/07/1993
Time in Service 26 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys
Cut Up 30/06/2002
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
D16 Nottingham Division (New) 18/11/1966
   Withdrawn 23/07/1993


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/11/1966 To Service To service as D8177
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16)
   
06/02/1972 Sightings Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed RO 4/1972 Link
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 20177    
23/07/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 20177    

prev prev