Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1323 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19126 Week
» 72142 Month
» 191669 Year
» 3218522 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3085 |
11/07/1964 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85030 |
16/07/1973 |
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
11/07/1965 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3085 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
16/07/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85030 |
|
|
11/09/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85030 |
|
|
09/10/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|