Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3759 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17165 Week
» 70181 Month
» 189708 Year
» 3216561 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3086 |
24/03/1962 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85031 |
11/1974 |
|
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/11/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
24/03/1962 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
03/11/1972 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3086 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
03/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85031 |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
21/05/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85031 |
|
|
16/09/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|