Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4197 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17603 Week
» 70619 Month
» 190146 Year
» 3216999 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3108 |
19/06/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86038 |
31/05/1974 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86438 |
06/02/1987 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86638 |
05/10/1990 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
19/06/1965 |
Status |
In Service |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
19/06/1965 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1971 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
10/1977 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
17/10/1977 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
19/06/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
10/1977 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
17/10/1977 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/06/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3108 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
31/05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86038 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
17/10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights with same profile as glass) |
|
|
06/02/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86438 |
|
|
05/10/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86638 |
|
|