Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2658 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16064 Week
» 69080 Month
» 188607 Year
» 3215460 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3109 |
19/06/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86016 |
29/09/1973 |
TOPS (86/3) |
86316 |
05/01/1982 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86416 |
26/03/1987 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
19/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
02/2002 |
Time in Service |
36 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys |
Cut Up |
01/06/2005 |
Cut At |
C F Booth Rotherham |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
19/06/1965 |
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/2002 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
05/01/1982 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
19/06/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
05/01/1982 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/06/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3109 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
29/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86016 |
|
|
05/01/1982 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
05/01/1982 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86316 |
|
|
26/03/1987 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86416 |
|
|
02/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 86416 |
|
|
01/06/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|