Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1076 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18879 Week
» 71895 Month
» 191422 Year
» 3218275 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3124 |
26/10/1965 |
TOPS (86/0) |
86035 |
04/1974 |
TOPS (86/4) |
86435 |
07/04/1986 |
TOPS (86/6) |
86635 |
04/09/1989 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
86 |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
26/10/1965 |
Status |
In Service |
|
Allocations
Code |
Name |
|
Date From |
|
(New) |
on |
26/10/1965 |
Modifications
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1972 |
|
Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
|
|
02/10/1976 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1977 |
|
Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
|
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
26/10/1965 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
02/10/1976 |
xe |
Dual braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/10/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3124 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
05/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Crosse Arm Pantograph |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86035 |
|
|
02/10/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Ballast weights fitted to bogies |
|
|
07/04/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86435 |
|
|
04/09/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 86635 |
|
|