Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 95 Today
» 921 Yesterday
» 4564 Week
» 5454 Month
» 313435 Year
» 1197816 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS E5003 27/04/1960
Pre TOPS E5018 27/04/1960
TOPS 71003 27/04/1960

Locomotive Specifics
Class 71
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 27/04/1960
Withdrawn 11/1977
Time in Service 17 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 03/1980
Cut At Cashmore's Newport
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 22/08/1966
   Stored w/e 03/10/1976
   Withdrawn 11/1977


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1960 To Service To service as E5018
Built at Doncaster Works
   
22/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
15/12/1968 Renumbered Renumbered to E5003    
12/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 71003    
03/10/1976 Allocation      
03/10/1976 To Store To Store    
11/1977 Withdrawn Condemned as 71003    
03/1980 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev