Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2532 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15938 Week
» 68954 Month
» 188481 Year
» 3215334 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Main) |
E5020 |
15/06/1960 |
Pre TOPS (2nd) |
E5005 |
31/10/1968 |
TOPS (TOPS) |
71005 |
12/1973 |
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E5020 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
22/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73f) |
|
|
31/10/1968 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5005 |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 71005 |
|
|
04/10/1976 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
04/10/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
11/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 71005 |
|
|
08/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|