Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 53 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 53 Week
» 14310 Month
» 242194 Year
» 1463759 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 1008 on 10/12/1945

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/12/1945 COUNTY OF CARDIGAN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class County
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 354
To Service Mon 10/12/1945
Withdrawal Mon 07/10/1963
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 17 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 10/12/1945
84K Chester West 4w/e 01/11/1952
83G Penzance 4w/e 14/06/1958
83D Laira 4w/e 09/08/1958
83G Penzance 4w/e 24/01/1959
83G Penzance 4w/e 03/12/1960
81E Didcot 4w/e 25/02/1961
87H Neyland 4w/e 06/10/1962
89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/02/1963
89A Shrewsbury w/e 02/03/1963
82C Swindon w/e 14/09/1963
   Withdrawn 07/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/12/1945
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 14/06/1958
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 83G Penzance m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 83G Penzance 4w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 87H Neyland 4w/e 06/10/1962
LOAN 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 02/03/1963
ALLOC 89A Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/03/1963
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 12/10/1963
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1949 Swindon Works New Work January: Nos. 6996 Blackwell Hall (RDG (4/1)), 6997 Bryn-Ivor Hall (17/1), 6998 Burton Agnes Hall (28/1); 6769 BRY (6/1). Locomotives entering Works 30/12/48 to 28/1/49: These included Nos. p24 (Petrol), 213/46 (Both acting as Works' pilots), 1007/08/19, 1369, 1426/29, 2016 (open cab), 2235/64/94, 2445, 2807/59, 2843, 2942/79/87, 3020/44, 3631/33, 3751, 3811/57 (damaged), 3818/28/55, 4017/41/46/53/59/74/78/79/86, 4122/37, 4225/82,, 4507/10/50/94, 4601, 4801 (Ex-Carriage Stock Shed-for conversion to coal-burning), 4912/15/21/35/58, 5014/27/29/49/57/61/92/93, 5108/34, 5225, 5307/33/48/58, 5502/05/12/31/53/72, 5909/49/61/97 , 6013/23/29, 6104/38/58/66, 6304/07/32/34/59/81, 6432, 6640, 6802/03/64/65/69, 6967, 7412, 7731/62/66/86/87, 7805, 8724/26, 9604/11/53, 9732/53/69, W.D. 77049 (badly damaged), 79279, 79309. Condemned: Nos. *1538, *1713, 2717 (all to Concentration Yard), 1889/97, 2767 (open cab), 2935, 3049, 3446/48, 4320. *After acting as Works' pilot.
Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, include Nos. 4900, 5997, 6930/39, while No. 2166 came out black and unlined-with the original boiler again. No. 3020 has had a heavy repair (with a change of boiler), fitted with a smokebox numberplate, but not re-painted
SLS/194903

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/12/1945 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 1008, name: COUNTY OF CARDIGAN
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
09/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (83G)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neyland (87H)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
02/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (89A)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
07/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 1008    

prev prev