Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 203 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6410 Week
» 3923 Month
» 231807 Year
» 1453372 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 1012 on 05/02/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
05/02/1946 COUNTY OF DENBIGH

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class County
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 354
To Service Tue 05/02/1946
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 18 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 05/02/1946
83D Laira 4w/e 28/02/1951
82C Swindon 4w/e 06/10/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC PDN Old Oak Common q/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC 83D Laira m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 06/10/1956
TOSTORE 82C Swindon 5w/e 30/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. SLS/194712
31/07/1949 Swindon Works New Work July: Nos. 1501 (1/7), 1502 (27/7). Both are unlined black. Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos. 1005/12/25, 1467/68, 2206, 2856/86, 2920, 3663, 3779, 3853, 4013/41/56/61, 4133, 4381, 4631, 4901/43, 5050/69, 5238, 5369, 5552/59, 5918, 6003, 6103/08/22, 6320 (for re-conversion), 6336/45/54, 6417, 6804/38, 6910, 7307, 7809, 7905, 8762. Condemned: 2708 an 9087. No. 3837 (ex 4854) has been re-converted to coal-burning. No. 6020 has been painted blue, while No. 4961 has been Painted black and fully lined. The first of the contractor built series of 94XX arrived on Works on 27/7 viz: Nos. 8400 an 8401; they have entered shops to have the A.T.C. gear fitted. Works' Nos. checked are: Bagnall 2910/11 of 1949.
Awaiting Works at the east end of the yard- were Nos. 1000, 2708, 2875, 3635, 4981, 5057, 5554/57, 6844; No. 2863 (ex 4805-oil-burning) was also in evidence. B shop contained Nos. 1363, 1467/68, 2206/11, 2572, 3663/77, 4631, 6408/09/17, 7735, 9638. New engines from Bagnall's were Nos. 8400/1 (makers Nos. 2910/1) and Swindon construction included Nos. 7026 (painted), 7027, 1504 (painted), 1505 and the frames of a diesel (Lot 363). Barry 0-6-2T's Nos. 212, 213 an 246 were acting as Works' shunters.
SLS/194909
31/08/1949 Swindon Works New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. SLS/194910

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/02/1946 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 1012, name: COUNTY OF DENBIGH
Built at Swindon Works
   
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 1012    

prev prev