Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 889 Today
» 1176 Yesterday
» 5803 Week
» 3316 Month
» 231200 Year
» 1452765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 2460 on 17/09/1936
BR 42460 w/e 24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 4P
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-4T
Builder Derby Works
To Service Sat 17/09/1936
Withdrawal Sat 28/08/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 17/09/1936
7B Bangor 01/01/1948
26D Bury 4w/e 06/10/1956
26C Bolton w/e 15/09/1962
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 26/09/1964
10C Fleetwood w/e 30/01/1965
   Withdrawn 28/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 26C Bolton 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 10C Fleetwood 3w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 28/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1961 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: D9, D50, D134-7, 42600/9, 44755/81, 44942, 45092, 45680, 46224, 49395, 78035 and the usual preserved locos. Out-side Paint Shop: D5031, 42117, 42639, 45421. 45690, 48205, 70043/9. Erecting Shop: D51-60, D235, D5137, 41200, 42234/67/83/92, 42437, 42606, 44680/4, 44739/49/53, 44806, 44985, 45034, 45147, 45233, 45369/83/95, 45568/9, 45625/39/60/84, 46166, 46230/44, 46485, 48080, 48111/34, 48304, 48429/53, 48518, 48601/74, 48733, 49141. 70031, 78036, 84001, 92025/93, 92167. Outside Erecting Shop: 42073, 45283, 45560, 46152, 70022, 90702. New Erecting Shop: D1/5, D229/31/6, D328, D5073, D5136. Works Sidings: 41262, 42460, 44686, 44756, 45140/5, 45215/27/79/98, 45645. 46109/21/7/50, 46236, 48172, 48416, 48649, 48930/50. 49246, 49313, 70026/42, 78037, 90147, 90413, 92018, 92159. Scrap Road: 47467, 47420, 47570 being cut up, 40074, 42220. 44088, 44249, 45544, 47755, 47405. 50850 intact. Works Shunters: D3584, 43957, 44374, 47618/61/77, 51412/46, 52093. SLS/196202

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/09/1936 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 2460
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bangor (7B)    
24/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42460    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
26/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
30/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (10C)    
28/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42460    

prev prev