Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 347 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3895 Week
» 4785 Month
» 312766 Year
» 1197147 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 3983 y/e 1922
BR 43983 w/e 30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Armstrong Whitworth
To Service During y/e 1922
Withdrawal Mon 09/08/1965
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 43 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
16D Mansfield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
17B Burton 4w/e 27/02/1954
16A Nottingham 4w/e 17/07/1954
20C Royston 8w/e 16/07/1955
   Withdrawn 09/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 17B Burton 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 16A Nottingham 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 20E Manningham 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   09/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1922 To Service To service as LMS Number 3983
Built at Armstrong Whitworth
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Mansfield (16D)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 43983    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
17/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 43983    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev