Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 4 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5348 Week
» 6238 Month
» 314219 Year
» 1198600 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4264 m/e 10/1926
BR 44264 w/e 05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 10/1926
Withdrawal 7w/e Sun 07/11/1965
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 39 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
16A Nottingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 08/09/1962
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 29/06/1963
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 13/06/1965
   Withdrawn 7w/e 07/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 22B Gloucester Barnwood w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 08/09/1962
TOSTORE NYA   4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 29/06/1963
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 13/06/1965
WDN   7w/e 07/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1926 To Service To service as LMS Number 4264
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44264    
08/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 44264    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev