Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 143 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4958 Week
» 11092 Month
» 238976 Year
» 1460541 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 4296 m/e 02/1927
BR 44296 w/e 19/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Fowler
Class 4F
Company History MR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service During 02/1927
Withdrawal 4w/e Mon 27/01/1964
Scrapping During 07/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1927
16B Spital Bridge 01/01/1948
22B Gloucester Barnwood 8w/e 29/11/1952
22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 31/10/1953
22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 16/06/1957
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 29/06/1963
   Withdrawn 4w/e 27/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 01/11/1952
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 22A Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 29/06/1963
WDN   4w/e 27/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1950 Inter regional allocations The following 44 LMR (16B) locos. were transferred to the Easter Region by virtue of the transfer of Spital Bridge (16B-35C) changing code and region on 13th August, 1950: 40180 3MT, 40401/10/82/97, 40532/58/59 2P, 40934, 41083 4P, 43319, 43651 3F, 43854/63/64, 43957/80/81, 44053/97, 44110/17/52/55, 44218/38/39/73/93/96, 44458/76, 44509/18/19, 4521, 44522 4F, 47269/70, 47566, 47621/22/59 3F, 48074 8MT (? should be 8F). SLS/195012
12/11/1959 Derby Works (Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay) Paint Shop:- M.R. 1000, 40026 G, 40031 G, 42350 I, 42540 I, 44428/521 I. 75013 I, D3795 New, D5028 New, D8 New; Diesel Erecting Shop:-12036/94, 13053; New Work:-6D-E.Sh. D3797-802uc; Test House:-D3796; Erecting Shop:-No. 1 Bay, 40039 G, 42387 I, 42527 G, 42537 G, 43887 G, 44104 G, 44109 I, 44143 I, 44296 I, 47286 G, 47292 I, 47522 I, 47592 G, 47673 G, 48609/69 G, 73131/7 I, 75063 I, Stripping:-42412/28stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 2 Bay:- 44197 I, 44735 Cas, 75036 I; Stripping:- 73066stripping; Erecting Shop:-No. 3 Bay:- 10 Bo-Bo 1160 H.P. D-E, 3 1-Co-Co-1 2300 H.P. D-E; Diesel Finishing Shop:-D5/7, D5029; Yard:-40513/680/925, 42312/21/54/85/88/507/80, 43233/47 94/370/531/766/85/829/934/98, 44694, 47309, 48000, 75050, 80065/82, 10100/800, 12093, D6, ED6. Cecil Raikes. SLS/195912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1927 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 4296
Built at Derby Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Spital Bridge (16B)    
19/11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 44296    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (22A)    
16/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Barnwood (22B)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
27/01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 44296    

prev prev