Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 142 Today
» 1216 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 11091 Month
» 238975 Year
» 1460540 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 62 y/e 1942
BR 30062 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Class USA
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Vulcan Ironwork (USA)
Works Number 4375
To Service During y/e 1942
Withdrawal w/e Sat 01/12/1962
Scrapping During 01/1968 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 21 yrs , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) y/e 1942
SOT Southampton Docks 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn w/e 01/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 01/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1947 General New 'West Country' Class completed were 21C153-155. Fourteen of the American type 0-6-0 side tanks have been purchased and are to be numbered 61-74: the U.S.A. Nos. are 1277/84, 4326, 1952/60/66/73 (Vulcan Iron Works Nos. 4375/82/88, 4425/33/39/46/47) and 1264, 1388/96, 1402/18/19 (H. K. Porter Nos. 7420, 7502/10/16/32/33). SLS/194702
31/05/1947 Southampton Docks Some of the U.S.A. 0-6-0 tanks, by Vulcan Iron Works, are already at work in Southern livery: 70 (ex-1960) and 72 (ex-1973) appeared in April, and 62 (ex-1277), 67 (ex-1282) and 66 (ex-1279) in May. Nos. 1959, 1971, and 1974 will soon be out as 64, 68 and 73 respectively. Other engines noted on the Docks in May were: 176 Guernsey, 97 Brittany, 98 Cherbourg, 96 Normandy, 102 Granville, 147 Dinard (all Class 'B.4') and a 0-4-0 saddle tank (name removed) MDE 177 (Barclay 1188/1910) derelict. Also two Stroudley 'E.1' tanks, one of which was 689. 89 Trouville was at Brighton, 82, 87 and 3744 at Eastleigh. A large number of withdrawn locos. still stand at Eastleigh, including W10, 3334 and L.B.S.C.R. 683 now showing the Marsh livery and lining, the S. & M. markings having disappeared; (this last was No. 9 Daphne on the S. & M.R.): also what must be the last L.S.W. duplicate number, 332 with underline. SLS/194708
15/11/1947 Southampton Docks On 15/11/47 the bulk of the work at Southampton Docks was being performed by the ex U.S.A. 0-6-0T's, except for the passenger shunting which is still being carried out by the 'El' 0-6-0T's; only three 'B4's' were noted-all dead. U.S.A. 0-6-0T's in the Docks or on shed comprised:-S.R. Nos. 62-64, 66-69, 72 an 73, also U.S. No. 4326. SLS/194801
30/09/1948 Southampton Docks No. 30062 is also now painted 'British Railways,' etc., in Gill Sans style, with smokebox numberplate. Nos, 81/5 are occasionally in steam, but Nos. 97 an 147 are still out of service in the old fruit warehouse. SLS/194811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
1942 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 62
Built at Vulcan Ironwork (USA), Works Number 4375
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southampton Docks (SOT)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 30062    
01/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 30062    

prev prev