06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh MPD |
On shed: 30182(72C), 30236(72F), 30120 in steam; 32646/61 have acquired 71A shed plates but not 32677 which is in a poor state. |
SLS/196002 |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
04/11/1961 |
Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D5000/3, D6530, E5008, 3733, 7782, 9629/77, 15211/34, 30051/7, 30480, 30543/7, 30830, 30921, 31808, 32343, 33028/33/40, 34015/49/57/63, 34103/10, 35010/27, 41206, 41324, 73020, 76059, 80145, 82013. Works Yard: 9732, 15233, 30120, 30859/, 34037/50/99, 76060/8, 92211. Scrap Yard: 30277, 30858, 31145, 31505. |
SLS/196112 |
26/11/1961 |
Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) |
Works Yard: D5006, D6530/63, 15211, 30065, 30120, 30782, 32349, 34072, 34103, 35006, 41275. Erecting Shop: D3460/2, D5003/11, 3798, 4616/26, 7782, 9629, 30057, 30531, 31808, 32343, 33023/33/40, 34007/15/6/33/57/94, 34110, 35008/9/10/8, 41206/16/70, 41301/24, 73018/20, 73113, 75079, 76059, 80154, 92239. Scrap Yard: 30023/59, 30247, 30584, 30858/9, 30918 intact. |
SLS/196201 |
28/02/1962 |
Drummond T9 restored |
The last Drummond ex-L.S.W.R. Class T9 4-4-0 loco. 30120 scheduled for preservation was out-shopped ex-Eastleigh Works during March, completely restored to the full glory of its pre-Grouping livery and numbered L.S.W.R. 120. |
SLS/196205 |