Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 597 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18400 Week
» 71416 Month
» 190943 Year
» 3217796 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
160 |
m/e |
03/1900 |
British Railways |
30160 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
G6 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 03/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/04/1959 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 1 mth , 27 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 160 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/1936 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30160 |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
17/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Basingstoke (70D) |
|
|
25/04/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30160 |
|
|
05/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|