Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1748 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19551 Week
» 72567 Month
» 192094 Year
» 3218947 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
306 |
m/e |
05/1901 |
British Railways |
30306 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Black Motors |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 05/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 21/04/1962 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1962 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1901 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
71B |
|
Bournemouth |
3w/e |
17/11/1956 |
71A |
|
Eastleigh |
6w/e |
01/04/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/04/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
71B |
Bournemouth |
P |
31/10/1956 |
ALLOC |
71A |
Eastleigh |
9w/e |
01/04/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/04/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
In shops 49, 30352, 30416/54/99, 30501/35/89, 30580 (ex 3506), 698, 30744/51/69, 30864, 30936/56, 32094, 32347, 32608, 34025/9/54/9/61/7/96/7/8. For shops 34055, 35010. Ex shops 30766/72, 34100 (dark green), 30484 (lined black), 30571 (ex 3397), 30306. Scrap: 30122, 154, 408. Noted un-renumbered: 246, 1432. No. 769 had just been renumbered. |
SLS/195108 |
29/12/1962 |
Southern Region |
On 29th December, Hove goods yard dump contained 30901/11/5/23, 32338/41/2, 32417/8/74/9 but owing to shortage of power 32474/9 were removed again early in January, 32479 going to Brighton and 32474 to Three Bridges where it has taken turns on the East Grinstead shuttle service in place of H Class engines (push/pull); as a lot of time was lost running round it is understood that M7s or standard 2-6-2Ts are to be provided to enable motor-working to be resumed. Although all 'withdrawn', some '700' class 0-6-0s are still in use on snowplough work and one was stuck in a snowdrift for several days near Meldon summit. 30306 was in steam at Guildford on 19th January. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 306 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30306 |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
01/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
21/04/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30306 |
|
|
05/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|