Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1226 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14632 Week
» 67648 Month
» 187175 Year
» 3214028 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
399 |
m/e |
08/1903 |
British Railways |
30399 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
S11 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 08/1903 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1951 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1903 |
9E |
|
Nine Elms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
FRA |
|
Fratton |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
70C |
|
Guildford |
6w/e |
20/03/1951 |
70G |
|
|
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
12/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
BM |
Bournemouth |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
TOSTORE |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
FRA |
Fratton |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
REINS |
70C |
Guildford |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/11/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 399 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30399 |
|
|
06/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
12/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30399 |
|
|
12/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|