Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1140 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18943 Week
» 71959 Month
» 191486 Year
» 3218339 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
415 |
m/e |
06/1904 |
British Railways |
30415 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Bulldogs |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 06/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1953 |
Service Life |
48 yrs , 8 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1904 |
BM |
|
Bournemouth |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
71D |
|
Fratton |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
02/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
71C |
Dorchester |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
REINS |
71C |
Dorchester |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
71D |
Fratton |
8w/e |
27/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
17/01/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1953 |
Eastleigh Works |
Scrapped in February: 30415. For scrap. 30197, 30204, 30754, 32694. |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 415 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30415 |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
02/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30415 |
|
|
02/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|