Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1838 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19641 Week
» 72657 Month
» 192184 Year
» 3219037 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
426 |
m/e |
12/1904 |
British Railways |
30426 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Bulldogs |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
To Service |
During 12/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1951 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
REINS |
71D |
Fratton |
3w/e |
10/06/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/10/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/11/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
On this date there was no sign of 756, either on shed or in works, so that it may have been broken up. 30253 was renumbered on 5th November, and DS3191 (ex 612) and 30426/7 were being cut up. Other engines in the scrap yard were S282, 30396, 30728/9, 2056, 2067. |
SLS/195201 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 426 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Basingstoke (BAS) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30426 |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
11/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30426 |
|
|
11/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|