Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2258 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20061 Week
» 73077 Month
» 192604 Year
» 3219457 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
701 |
m/e |
05/1897 |
British Railways |
30701 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Black Motors |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 05/1897 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/07/1961 |
Service Life |
64 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1897 |
9E |
|
Nine Elms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
29/07/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/10/1951 |
S.R. Corrections |
2359 is not the last Stroudley 'D' tank, as 701s is still in store at Nine Elms; in addition, 2357 is still in service on the County Mental Hospital Railway, Whittingham. Further, 1602 is not the last of the Kirtley L.C. & D.R. locomotives in service, as 1600 is still at work at Haydock Colliery, near St. Helens, and several of the class R tanks, 31658-75 are still running. |
SLS/195111 |
06/12/1951 |
Brighton Works |
The last new tank for 1951 is No. 80025, due by 20/12. No. s2060 is being scrapped, and 0-4-2T 701S will shortly follow. No. 32021 was still waiting scrapping during the latter part of December. Among engines under repair is Kirtley 0-4-4T No. 31663, still bearing Sharp Stewart & Co. plates 3727/1891 (old L.C. & D.R. No. 204). |
SLS/195202 |
10/03/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop:-30060/6/133/247/701/88, 34011/5/27/8/33/61/82/92/106, 41304, 73082/112/4, 76019, 80039/42/83/137; Boxhill. Dump:-30770; Ex-works:- 32103, 34050/70, 41312; Waiting works:-30056/129/4035/504, 76055, 80140; Ex-works:- 32104 (75C), 73050 (82F), 80095 (6C) plate, 73118; On shed (damaged):- 34084. |
SLS/196004 |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 701 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30701 |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30701 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|