Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1903 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15309 Week
» 68325 Month
» 187852 Year
» 3214705 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
702 |
m/e |
01/1899 |
British Railways |
30702 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 01/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/10/1959 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 702 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yeovil Town (YEO) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30702 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
10/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
24/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30702 |
|
|