Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 122 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17925 Week
» 70941 Month
» 190468 Year
» 3217321 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
711 |
m/e |
06/1899 |
British Railways |
30711 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 06/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/08/1959 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 711 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Plymouth Friary (PLY) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30711 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
08/08/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30711 |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|