Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2569 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15975 Week
» 68991 Month
» 188518 Year
» 3215371 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
714 |
m/e |
06/1899 |
British Railways |
30714 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 06/1899 |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1951 |
Service Life |
51 yrs , 10 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1951 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
31/03/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 714 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Yeovil Town (YEO) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30714 |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
31/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
04/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30714 |
|
|
04/1951 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|