Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 909 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14315 Week
» 67331 Month
» 186858 Year
» 3213711 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
717 |
m/e |
09/1899 |
British Railways |
30717 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 09/1899 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/07/1961 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 717 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wadebridge (WAD) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30717 |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wadebridge (WAD) |
|
|
12/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (EXJ) |
|
|
30/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E) |
|
|
13/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barnstaple Junction (72E) |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A) |
|
|
29/07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30717 |
|
|
08/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|