Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2612 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16018 Week
» 69034 Month
» 188561 Year
» 3215414 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
733 |
m/e |
11/1901 |
British Railways |
30733 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Drummond |
Class |
Greyhounds |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Dübs & Co |
To Service |
During 11/1901 |
Withdrawal |
During 06/1952 |
Service Life |
50 yrs , 7 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1952 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BM |
Bournemouth |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
TOSTORE |
71B |
Bournemouth |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
REINS |
71D |
Fratton |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
ALLOC |
71B |
Bournemouth |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
REINS |
71D |
Fratton |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
71D |
Fratton |
7w/e |
21/01/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/04/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 733 Built at Dübs & Co |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
01/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30733 |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
1952 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
21/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Fratton (71D) |
|
|
06/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30733 |
|
|